Accounts and annual returns ALL SAINTS UNDER FIVES (NEWMARKET) PRE-SCHOOL PLAY GROUP

Charity Number: 1069684
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 27 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 08 February 2017 3 days late
Annual return 05 April 2015 21 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 26 January 2016 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2014 27 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 29 January 2015 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2013 24 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 04 February 2014 On Time