BRIGHTON UNEMPLOYED CENTRE FAMILIES PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty, distress and hardship amongst unemployed and low waged people and their families living or staying in the Brighton area regardless of Race Sex Age or Sexual Orientation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £41,210 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 22 April 1998: Standard registration
- BRIGHTON UNEMPLOYED CENTRE FAMILY PROJECT (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark King | Chair | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Joseph Maguire | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruby Potter | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Margaret Godfrey | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Alan Cheek | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kristen McCully | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynnette Joseph | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.07k | £268.62k | £239.86k | £239.86k | £241.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.99k | £223.39k | £232.29k | £232.29k | £254.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.75k | £48.10k | £46.51k | £38.00k | £41.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25TH MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED 8 MARCH 2001, 10 JULY AND 16 OCTOBER 2002, 12 NOVEMBER 2003 AND 16 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND HARDSHIP AMONGST UNEMPLOYED, UNWAGED AND LOW WAGED PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING OR STAYING IN THE BRIGHTON AREA REGARDLESS OF RACE, SEX, AGE OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION.
Area of benefit
BRIGHTON AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUCFP
6 TILBURY PLACE
BRIGHTON
BN2 0GY
- Phone:
- 01273601211
- Email:
- info@bucfp.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window