Financial history THE ROGER & IRENE GRAHAM CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1070272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £13.76k £8.92k £11.36k £11.00k £49.11k
Total expenditure £68.90k £44.07k £82.33k £86.08k £98.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A