THE WEST RIDING COUNTY FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations received from members and grants made where deemed appropriate
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 10 July 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Byrne | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neville Wordsworth | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH SIMPSON | Trustee | 11 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARRY GEORGE CHAPLIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.89k | £1.56k | £1.59k | £3.74k | £4.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £802 | £79 | £803 | £2.21k | £1.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 May 2025 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 10 MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED 12 MAY 1998
Charitable objects
TO GIVE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND OF SICKNESS TO PLAYERS, REFEREES AND OTHERS DIRECTLY CONNECTED WITH CLUBS, LEAGUES OR OTHER DIRECTLY CONNECTED WITH CLUBS, LEAGUES OR OTHER BODIES WITHIN THE JURISDICTION OF THE WEST RIDING COUNTY FOOTBALL CLUB OR RESIDING WITHIN THE ASSOCIATION'S AREA AS DEFINED UNDER THE RULES OF THE ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
WEST RIDING
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLEET LANE
WOODLESFORD
LEEDS
WEST YORKSHIRE
LS26 8NX
- Phone:
- 01132821222
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window