Trustees BRITISH SOCIETY OF CRIMINOLOGY
Charity number: 1073154
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Pamela Ann DAVIES | Chair | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Elizabeth Watson | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Greta Squire | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amy Meenaghan | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Loraine Gelsthorpe | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Tangen | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Plimley | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tammy Ayres | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angus Nurse | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carina O'Reilly | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Barlow | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gemma Ann-Louise Birkett | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Monish Bhatia | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Irene Zempi | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Esmorie Jacqueline Miller | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hannah Bows | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Grace Ann Gallacher | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jayne Price | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Edward Millie | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marian Duggan | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victoria Louise Heap | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jo Smith | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sandra Walklate | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor James Treadwell | Trustee | 10 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Vipond | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andromachi TSELONI | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr HARRIET LOUISE PIERPOINT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR BARRY GOLDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.