HEATHFIELD LEISURE PURSUITS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping the people of Heathfield of all ages and background through the Community Centre's support system, education and recreational facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
- Torbay
Governance
- 22 July 1999: Standard registration
- HELP (HEATHFIELD) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Morgan | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Tester | Trustee | 14 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victor Tester | Trustee | 14 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Councillor George Gribble | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.82k | £15.24k | £14.29k | £8.95k | £7.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.29k | £12.99k | £16.10k | £19.35k | £26.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 January 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2022 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HEATHFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT' WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND HEALTH AND TO PROVIDE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE' AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
HEATHFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heathfield Leisure Pursuits Ltd
10 Cannon Road
Heathfield
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ12 6SH
- Phone:
- 01626834420
- Email:
- heathfieldcc@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window