THE OXFORD CENTRE FOR HINDU STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal aim of the Centre, founded in 1997, is the study of Hindu culture, religion, languages, literature, philosophy, history, arts, and society, in all periods and in all parts of the world. All Hindu traditions are included.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 March 1999: Standard registration
- OCHS (Working name)
- THE OXFORD CENTRE FOR VAISHNAVA AND HINDU STUDIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD NAVNIT DHOLAKIA OBE DL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Pujan Patel | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR DIWAKAR ACHARYA | Trustee | 23 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Ajay Piramal | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
AZAD SHIVDASANI | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MARK SMITH | Trustee | 06 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Madhu Ruia | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ramesh Venkataraman | Trustee | 27 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mark Edwards | Trustee | 27 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHAUNAKA RISHI DAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £413.46k | £780.14k | £611.37k | £1.30m | £436.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £541.93k | £589.56k | £507.72k | £612.13k | £733.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.92k | £107.76k | £40.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £295.91k | £340.47k | £1.14m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £306.66k | £222.16k | £159.87k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £69.81k | £8.72k | £2.24k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £107.76k | £40.02k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £265.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £589.56k | £507.72k | £612.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £59.15k | £30.57k | £27.02k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 FEBRUARY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 5.5.6 AS AMENDED BY DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF HINDU STUDIES, WHICH EXPRESSION SHALL IN THESE OBJECTS BE DEEMED TO INCLUDE TEACHING AND STUDIES OF THE LANGUAGE PERTAINING TO HINDUISM, HINDU LITERATURE AND SUBJECTS WHICH ARE, IN THE OPINION OF THE BOARD OF GOVERNORS, ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE AND FACILITIES FOR POST GRADUATE RESEARCH IN HINDU STUDIES AND TRANSLATION OF PERTAINING LANGUAGES AND OTHER WORKS, AND THE COMPILATION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ARCHIVE RELATING TO HINDU COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
OXFORD CENTRE FOR HINDU STUDIES
13-15 MAGDALEN STREET
OXFORD
OX1 3AE
- Phone:
- 01865304300
- Email:
- info@ochs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window