DANEMEAD SCOUT CAMPSITE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing camping and educational training facilities for young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 22 May 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Harrison | Chair | 11 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Evans | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Harris | Trustee | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Finnis | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Miller | Trustee | 27 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Pytches | Trustee | 07 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Christopher Stevenson | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David George Brett | Trustee | 14 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.14k | £189.87k | £51.66k | £61.62k | £62.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.09k | £176.46k | £65.53k | £53.31k | £74.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.24k | £11.23k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF THE SCOUTS ASSOCIATION DATED 4 JANUARY 1912 AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28 MARCH 1948, 18 FEBRUARY 1959, 5 MAY 1967 AND 19 JULY 1991.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Northside
Galley Hill
Waltham Abbey
EN9 2AR
- Phone:
- 01992715895
- Website:
-
danemeadcampsite.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window