ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION GUILDFORD BRANCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer help, comradeship and financial assistance when required to members of the Royal Naval Association and their dependents. Membership is open to all past and present members of the Naval Forces and the Royal Fleet Auxiliary Service and their dependants. Help and assistance is given through donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 18 August 1998: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- RNA GUILDFORD BRANCH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.12k | £219 | £334 | £215 | £279 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £326 | £373 | £301 | £180 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 05 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 05 July 2009 | 247 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SUPPLEMENTAL ROYAL CHARTER AND RULES AND BYE LAWS OF THE RNA (266982)
Charitable objects
AS PER RNA (266982)
Area of benefit
GUILDFORD, SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window