Trustees FEVERED SLEEP
Charity number: 1069144

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Selina Ocean | Chair | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margherita Barbagallo | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Guangduo Zhang | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Fu | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alex Tyrrell | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROS ATTILLE | Trustee | 12 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
CONRAD LYNCH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.