THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S BRAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for the preservation, repair, restoration and improvement of St Michael's Church, Bray including its churchyard and St Michael's Hall, and provision of articles for use in worship at the Church; also support for music and other charitable activities in the parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 12 June 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNDA JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM ROBERT BANKS | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Barker | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.40k | £6.60k | £3.53k | £7.25k | £12.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.22k | £6.00k | £98 | £15.06k | £63 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 10 MARCH 1998.
Charitable objects
TO RAISE FUNDS FOR THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, RESTORATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ORNAMENTATION AND FABRIC OF ST. MICHAEL'S BRAY AND ITS CHURCHYARD AND ST. MICHAEL'S HALL, SO LONG AS THESE BUILDINGS REMAIN THE RESPONSIBILITY OF THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL, AND ARE USED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES, AND TO PROVIDE ARTICLES FOR USE IN WORSHIP IN ST. MICHAEL'S BRAY.
Area of benefit
ST. MICHAEL'S BRAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tutchens
Sheepcote Lane
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 3JU
- Phone:
- 01628622090
- Email:
- bbanks1704@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window