ARACHNE GREEK CYPRIOT WOMEN'S GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes the benefit of Greek and Greek Cypriot women and children to advance education, provide facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation to improve the conditions of life of the said women and children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £46,049 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 June 1999: Standard registration
- 23 March 2023: Funds received from 1056039 ISLINGTON CYPRIOT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- ARACHNE GREEK CYPRIOT WOMEN'S GROUP (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTALLA SAVVA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Helen Cylwik | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Elena Lambrou | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
KIRIAKOULA SOPHIE PAPAMICHAEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIA GEORGOULA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.46k | £193.68k | £656.46k | £662.59k | £189.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.19k | £157.26k | £118.33k | £127.93k | £172.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £40.28k | £24.04k | £42.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £46.03k | £11.19k | £31.00k | £46.05k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £156.46k | £613.21k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £31.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £18.39k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £500.00k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £118.33k | £125.59k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £2.34k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £4.79k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH APRIL 1999
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND IN PARTICULAR GREEK AND GREEK CYPRIOT WOMEN AND CHILDREN BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (2) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; (3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR SICKNESS AND THE DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH.
Area of benefit
ISLINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Arachne Greek Cypriot Womens Group
13-15 Hercules Street
LONDON
N7 6AT
- Phone:
- 02072636336
- Email:
- info@arachne-group.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window