LIVING TEMPLES MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Advancement of the Christian Faith in the United Kingdom and oversees and relieve persons in poverty, illness and depression through biblical principles and inspirational music therapy resulting in productive living, good health and great Socio Economic Recovery. Regeneration of Inmates and rehabilitation of Ex convicts via Christian principles resulting in good citizenship and law abiding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of London
- Ghana
Governance
- 19 November 1998: Standard registration
- CALVARY REDEMPTIVE POWER CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Previous name)
- GREENFIELD FAITH FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CALEB JACKSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Roslyn Gibson | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Lamptey | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELDER EMMANUEL OPPONG OWUSU | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.92k | £3.52k | £1.62k | £9.01k | £11.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.95k | £877 | £1.58k | £4.86k | £13.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 10 FEBRUARY 1998 AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 21 AUGUST 1998, 12 MARCH 2001 AND 3 MAY 2006.
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY 3. THE REHABILITATION AND REINTEGRATION OF EX-PRISONERS AND OFFENDERS AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL TRAINING AND OTHER FACILITIES CALCULATED TO INCREASE THE OPPORTUNITIES FOR PRISONERS TO PLAY A FULL AND USEFUL PART IN SOCIETY UPON THEIR RELEASE FROM DETENTION ACCORDING TO CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES. 4. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND COUNSELLING ON ADOPTION AND FOSTERING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
Tropical Court
Kilburn Lane
LONDON
W10 4AD
- Phone:
- 07903136592
- Email:
- ltmengland@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window