NORFOLK PARK FAMILY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 16 June 1999: Standard registration
- 28 September 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 28 September 2007: Funds transferred to 1111532 NORFOLK PARK FAMILY CENTRE
- NORFOLK PARK WOMEN AND CHILDREN CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 19 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 23 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 23 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JULY 1991 AS AMENDED ON 30 NOVEMBER 1998, 15 MARCH 1999, 9 APRIL 2003 AND 18 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORFOLK PARK AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND THE CHILDREN OF SUCH INHABITANTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, AGE, RACE, NATIONALITY OR DISABLEMENT, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY BRINGING TOGETHER THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND LOCAL RESIDENTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, TRAINING, SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PEOPLE
Area of benefit
NORFOLK PARK ESTATE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window