DISABILITY, PREGNANCY AND PARENTHOOD INFORMATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DPPI's work is for the benefit of disabled parents and disabled people who are prospective parents. Information and expertise is disseminated through our publications and guides through our website. We provide support & guidance via our website and in response to email enquiries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 June 1998: Standard registration
- DISABILITY PREGNANCY & PARENTHOOD INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- DPPI (Working name)
- DISABILITY, PREGNANCY AND PARENTHOOD INTERNATIONAL (D.P.P.I) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Krishna Ramamurthy | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nik Dadson | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUE JOHNSON-SEARLE | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.34k | £635 | £593 | £149 | £96 | |
|
Total expenditure | £195 | £222 | £35 | £177 | £177 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 09/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST DISABLED PARENTS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, EXPERTISE AND OTHER MEANS ON ALL ASPECTS OF PREGNANCY, CHILDBIRTH AND PARENTING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
106 Muswell Hill Road
LONDON
N10 3JR
- Phone:
- 07890317492
- Email:
- info@disabledparent.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window