DIFFICULT AIRWAY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of public education in the science & prctice of airway management. Provide research & development of new techniques.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 September 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ravi Bhagrath | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fauzia Ahmad | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Imran Ahmad | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.26k | £95.03k | £65.74k | £81.92k | £178.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.39k | £60.35k | £60.23k | £67.07k | £94.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 28TH NOVEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED ON 25 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF THE MANAGEMENT OF PATIENTS WITH DIFFICULT OR UNUSUAL AIRWAY PROBLEMS, BY THE CONDUCT OF COURSES, LECTURES, DEMONSTRATIONS AND BY ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS PAID TO AIRWAY MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES IN THE TRAINING CURRICULA OF MEDICAL AND PARAMEDICAL PRACTITIONERS (B) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW TECHNIQUES IN DEALING WITH AIRWAY PROBLEMS, AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SAAD
21 Portland Place
LONDON
W1B 1PY
- Phone:
- 07928051858
- Email:
- treasurer@das.uk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window