THE FRIENDS OF TRURO CATHEDRAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Income is received from annual subscriptions, investment income and fund raising. Legacies are irregularly received. Grants are awarded to the fabric of Truro Cathedral, its musical foundation, flower guild and other projects as agreed at annual general meeting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Cornwall
Governance
- 19 November 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Wright | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Wright | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
The Very Reverend Simon Joseph Robinson | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham David Smith | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Barnes Cockeram | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lingham | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hare | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hare | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lady Deidre Neale | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Miller | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Neil Welton | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.35k | £11.05k | £6.30k | £21.06k | £19.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.80k | £40.93k | £1.35k | £15.02k | £29.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AMENDED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT THE DEAN AND CHAPTER IN FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST MARY IN TRURO FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION
Area of benefit
TRURO
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRURO CATHEDRAL OFFICE
Old Cathedral School
cathedral Close
TRURO
TR1 2FQ
- Phone:
- 01872 276782
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window