YOUTH ENQUIRY SERVICE, BRIXHAM, LTD.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charities objects are to advance in life and relieve the needs of people of all ages living in Torbay and the neighbourhood, who by reason of their social, physical or economic circumstances are in need, hardship or distress, through various leisure and educational activities, advice and guidance and the provision and promotion of residential accomodation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £63,807 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
58 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Torbay
Governance
- 19 October 1998: Standard registration
- 23 June 2022: Funds received from 256170 STAPLETON HOUSE
- YES (BRIXHAM) LTD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Snell | Chair | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Patricia Murphy | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Carton | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £280.05k | £675.25k | £360.99k | £368.33k | £398.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £372.68k | £413.12k | £445.58k | £423.38k | £406.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £89.83k | £51.34k | £4.00k | £16.00k | £63.81k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £410.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £34.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £195.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £34.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £379.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £33.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 April 2022 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 April 2022 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/10/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES LIVING IN TORBAY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (C) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (D) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; AND/OR (E) THE PROVISION AND PROMOTION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.IN PRACTICE IN BRIXHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Edge
Bolton Street
BRIXHAM
TQ5 9DH
- Phone:
- 01803851414
- Email:
- info@yesbrixham.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window