Accounts and annual returns THE COLLEGE OF CHIROPRACTORS

Charity Number: 1073016
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2014 03 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2014 03 October 2014 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2012 11 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 11 July 2013 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2011 21 March 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 21 March 2012 On Time