Governing document THE COLLEGE OF CHIROPRACTORS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/10/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/02/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/09/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/01/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE ART, SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF CHIROPRACTIC; 2) TO IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN STANDARDS IN THE PRACTICE OF CHIROPRACTIC FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; 3) TO PROMOTE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF CHIROPRACTIC AMONGST MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS AND OTHER HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS AND THE PUBLIC; 4) TO EDUCATE AND TRAIN PRACTITIONERS IN THE ART, SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF CHIROPRACTIC; 5) TO ADVANCE THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH IN CHIROPRACTIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.