ASSOCIATION OF GREATER LONDON OLDER WOMEN (AGLOW)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To bring together older women to discuss and campaign around issues affecting them and therefore raise the collective voice of older women. To recognise that issues relevant to older women depend on our ethnic backgrund, clas, age, sexuality, physical and mental capabilities and ensure that these concerns are incuded in the work of AGLOW. To raise awareness and promote good practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 July 1998: Standard registration
- AGLOW (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAT HOLT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JO PANTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IVY WATTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £293 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 28TH MAY 1998
Charitable objects
A. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF OLDER WOMEN AGED 50 AND OVER WHO LIVE OR WORK IN GREATER LONDON BY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE REGARDING EDUCATION, TRAINING, INFORMATION, PENSIONS, HEALTH, COMMUNITY CARE, HOUSING. B. THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF OLDER WOMEN RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. C. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR OLDER WOMEN RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
6-9 MANOR GARDENS
LONDON
N7 6LA
- Phone:
- 02072813485
- Email:
- aglowlondon@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window