UTTLESFORD COMMUNITY TRAVEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a community transport service in the district of Uttlesford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £190,756 from 6 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 20 November 1998: Standard registration
- UCT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN CAMPBELL SHAW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Patricia Margaret Churchill | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Margaret Tokley | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Felicity M M Benson | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MR STEVE BIDDLECOMBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315.73k | £336.54k | £435.21k | £401.07k | £335.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £314.71k | £297.97k | £426.74k | £417.03k | £349.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £181.06k | £180.06k | £193.36k | £180.06k | £190.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 OCTOBER 1997, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 14 OCTOBER 1998, 25 OCTOBER 2005 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THE INHABITANTS OF THE DISTRICT OF UTTLESFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS WHO HAVE NEED BECAUSE OF AGE, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY, POVERTY, PARTICULARLY THOSE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, OR BY REASON OF INADEQUATE MEANS ARE UNABLE TO TRANSPORT THEMSELVES AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING:- (A) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A NON-PROFIT COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE, COMPLEMENTARY TO EXISTING PUBLIC TRANSPORT SERVICES, WHICH SHALL BE OPEN TO ALL MOBILITY IMPAIRED RESIDENTS OF THE DISTRICT, AND (B) TO ASSIST THE CHARITABLE WORK OF ORGANISATIONS AND BODIES ENGAGED IN PROMOTING THE RELIEF OF SUCH PERSONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE SERVICES.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF UTTLESFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
UTTLESFORD COMMUNITY TRAVEL
UNIT 1
FLITCH INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
CHELMSFORD ROAD
DUNMOW
CM6 1XJ
- Phone:
- 01371875787
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window