GRAPEVINE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith and the worship of God. To support, as the trustees see fit, the world-wide relief of persons who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
- Israel
Governance
- 26 May 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Eardley | Chair |
|
||||||
Milika Themba Miti | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven David Mack | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wookey | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MARK LITTLEWOOD | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE JOHN FARTHING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP JAMES GREGG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.07k | £25.01k | £22.00k | £21.83k | £22.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.64k | £27.74k | £18.33k | £16.98k | £22.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 APRIL 1998 as amended on 27 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD (2) TO SUPPORT, AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, THE WORLD-WIDE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
WORLD-WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 High Street
Hillmorton
Rugby
CV21 4EG
- Phone:
- 01788562884
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window