Trustees George Tomlinson Parents, Teachers and Friends Association
Charity number: 1069329

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirstin Kinloch-Steyn | Chair | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Milway | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ford | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lily Lowe-Myers | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke James Newman | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Will Courtney-Hatcher | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Ede | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Boyd | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tulna Chauhan | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alayna Malamoutsi | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tomas O'Laoide | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Ryan | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gevher Cagla Ceylan | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Wilson | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Cundy | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Freya Brett | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Veitch | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Inayaili Vieira de Leon | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarune Jankuviene | Trustee | 19 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.