SALISBURY AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur Boxing Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 04 July 1998: Standard registration
- SALISBURY ABC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher George Farley | Chair | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Mcdermott | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Francis Kennedy | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Burke | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jimmy Carrol | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Vincent Challinor | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.10k | £35.52k | £28.57k | £17.12k | £14.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.70k | £9.00k | £20.79k | £24.73k | £25.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | £1.90k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 September 2024 | 592 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 19 September 2024 | 592 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 June 2022 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 21 June 2022 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 May 2021 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 APRIL 1998
Charitable objects
TO HELP EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN WEST EVERTON COMMUNITY THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY IMPROVE WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THE TEACHING OF AMATEUR BOXINGG
Area of benefit
WEST EVERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 WANGO LANE
LIVERPOOL
L10 8JG
- Phone:
- 07791040311
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window