The Cycle (INGO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cycle's commitment is to the alleviation of poverty. It focuses its efforts on sanitation, water and livelihoods (although not exclusively), and implements programmes that engages the communities in which it works, as a means to empower local people to make them self sufficient.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
Governance
- 31 July 1998: Standard registration
- SANITATION FIRST (Previous name)
- SANITATION FIRST LIMITED (Previous name)
- WHEREVER THE NEED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Anderson | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Jane Galton | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rama Murali | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Collins | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mandakini Lakhani | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|||||
JULES PECK | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYNN STRONGIN DODDS | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BARRS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 31/01/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.62k | £120.88k | £246.39k | £416.16k | £467.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £259.44k | £110.11k | £225.47k | £246.39k | £407.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23/03/98 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20/06/98 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16/08/06 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 08/02/08 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/04/16 as amended on 31 Oct 2022 as amended on 15 Jan 2025 as amended on 15 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
(A) The relief of human suffering and distress in any part of the World resulting from disaster of any kind, and (B) The protection of human life in particular but not exclusively by providing suitably trained and experienced response teams free of charge upon receipt of request for such assistance, and (C) The prevention or relief of poverty by providing safe water, sanitation, and hygiene (WASH) infrastructure; offering education and training to empower communities; promoting sustainable WASH practices such as waste-to-resource initiatives and water management; supporting regenerative agriculture practices to enhance soil health, food security and livelihoods; and advocating for policies that drive sustainable development and poverty reduction.
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 5328
Westbury
BA13 9BR
- Phone:
- 07939576504
- Email:
- info@thecycle.world
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window