STOBERRY PARK SCHOOL CIRCLE OF FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for activities which supports the school and advance the education of the pupils attending it To provide and assist in the provision of such facilities or items for education at the school (not provided from statutory funds) as the committee in collaboration with the Governing Body shall from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 23 March 1999: Standard registration
- Friends of Stoberry Park School (Working name)
- STOBERRY PARK CIRCLE OF FRIENDS (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF STOBERRY PARK SCHOOL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Mackenzie Pullen | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Nicholls | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Allan Carey | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Bollini | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Payne | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Howells | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexia James | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Carly Delbridge | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.52k | £6.29k | £2.40k | £7.81k | £7.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.06k | £4.04k | £614 | £2.29k | £2.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 FEB 1999 AS AMENDED ON 05 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED ON 24 SEP 2015 as amended on 24 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
To advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE WELLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stoberry Park School
North Road
WELLS
Somerset
BA5 2TJ
- Phone:
- 01749672516
- Email:
- stoberrypta@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window