Financial history ASHDON VILLAGE MUSEUM

Charity number: 1070499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/07/2020 09/07/2021 09/07/2022 09/07/2023 09/07/2024
Total gross income £15.18k £12.72k £14.58k £12.91k £24.98k
Total expenditure £10.66k £6.25k £10.31k £19.67k £8.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.67k N/A N/A