REGENCY FOUNDATION NETWORX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCE EDUCATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- South Africa
Governance
- 09 March 1999: Standard registration
- REGENCY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE REGENCY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Kyle | Trustee | 14 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
JUSTIN KYLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.51k | £1.37k | £0 | £900 | £650 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51k | £1.37k | £0 | £178 | £636 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 March 2025 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2025 | 515 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2ND MARCH 1998, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3RD FEBRUARY 1999, AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON NAME CHANGE DATED 4TH JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL INITIATIVES AND UNDERTAKING RESEARCH TO PROMOTE AND RAISE AWARENESS OF THE WORK OF UNITED NATIONS AND ITS AGENCIES (IN SUCH FIELDS AS WORLD HEALTH, POVERTY REDUCTION, CARING FOR THE ENVIRONMENT, RELIEF OF REFUGEES, HELPING CHILDREN) AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cardinal Point
Park Road
Rickmansworth
Beds
WD3 1RE
- Phone:
- 07309399753
- Email:
- richardk@regency.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window