Financial history HERTS & ESSEX MOSQUE & ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1070820
Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £35.08k £35.14k £20.97k £17.03k £32.13k
Total expenditure £24.17k £26.96k £35.97k £21.81k £25.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A