SUTTON NATURE CONSERVATION VOLUNTEERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The SNCV carries out practical habitat management to improve and enhance areas of natural greenspace for local communities. Through our volunteer programme, people from a variety of backgrounds can gain practical work experience by learning new skills. Volunteers have the opportunity to meet new people, improve fitness as well as learning about wildlife conservation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 May 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Haggis | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Dewey | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Diana Hurter | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK FEATHERSTONE | Trustee | 15 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.32k | £403 | £303 | £1.26k | £320 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.04k | £1.87k | £1.36k | £643 | £2.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
(1) TO CONSERVE THE ENVIRONMENT, MAINLY USING VOLUNTEERS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF CONSERVATION..
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
SNCV c/o London Borough of Sutton
Biodiversity Team
Civic Offices
Saint Nicholas Way
Sutton
SM1 1EA
- Phone:
- 07872 510 122
- Email:
- sncvvolunteers@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window