SUNDERLAND SPORTS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds with the purpose of giving financial support for the benefit of young people who are under 25 years of age (exceptions to this age limit will be made for participants active in a paralympic sports category and coaches who receive direct financial assistance from the Fund) who are either members of a sports club or group, or who are talented sports individuals living or training w
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sunderland
Governance
- 10 August 1999: Standard registration
- SUNDERLAND SPORTS COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LES SCOTT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jeffrey Allen Brown | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Shield | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Fiona Miller | Trustee | 26 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Sidney Anderson | Trustee | 26 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEITH LOWES | Trustee | 07 June 2013 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINA ANNE SHORT JP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.55k | £5 | £0 | £5 | £413 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.91k | £445 | £2.99k | £792 | £244 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JANUARY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 10 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE CITY OF SUNDERLAND ("THE CITY") IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE EITHER TO PERSONS HAVING NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR TO PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY FIVE
Area of benefit
CITY OF SUNDERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Church Lane North
Murton
Seaham
SR7 9RJ
- Phone:
- 01915262545
- Email:
- KEITH.LOWES@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window