TAKE OFF
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running condition related and general support groups, encouraging and arranging activities that promote socialisation and rehabilitation, and providing employment, for people suffering or recovering from mental health problems
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 01 June 1998: Standard registration
- 15 April 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1191902 TAKE OFF
- CAFF (Working name)
- CANTERBURY AND DISTRICT MENTAL HEALTH FORUM (Previous name)
- CANTERBURY AND FAVERSHAM FORUM FOR MENTAL HEALTH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.38k | £254.91k | £297.59k | £242.24k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £231.46k | £222.82k | £233.06k | £267.77k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £6.47k | N/A | £40.69k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.72k | £18.59k | £42.14k | £40.69k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAR 1998 AS AMENDED ON 07 MAR 2008 AS AMENDED ON 09 OCT 2014
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD MENTAL HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS IN THE CANTERBURY CITY COUNCIL AND FAVERSHAM TOWN AREAS (THE AREA OF BENEFIT), PROVIDED THAT IN SO DOING, THE FORUM WILL NOT RELIEVE THE LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITY OR ANY NATIONAL HEALTH TRUST OF THEIR STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS TO PROVIDE SUCH SERVICES.
Area of benefit
CANTERBURY CITY COUNCIL AND FAVERSHAM TOWN AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window