SALUSBURY WORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Accredited advice and advocacy for refugee & asylum-seeking adults, social and community support, education, cultural activities & training for refugee adults, mentoring for young people, volunteering, holiday activities for children & young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £78,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 August 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Self | Chair | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nasrat Sayyad | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amin Sohrabi | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Weitzman | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Lavender | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Piller Roner | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Ali | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Clara Jeria | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Giles Deards | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KAYE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £362.99k | £319.08k | £298.84k | £316.93k | £255.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £367.42k | £277.58k | £325.78k | £382.05k | £312.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £22.10k | £46.74k | £78.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE ON 13TH JULY 1998
Charitable objects
1) ADVANCE EDUCATION 2) RELIEVE POVERTY 3) DISTRESS AND SUFFERING 3) PRESERVE AND PROTECT PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL HEALTH BY APPROPRIATE CHARITABLE - EDUCATIONAL, REHABILITATIVE, FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE. IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) AMONGST CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO HAVE COME TO THE UNITED KINGDOM FROM OTHER COUNTRIES AND WHO ARE VICTIMS OF BREACHES OF HUMAN RIGHTS, WAR OR CIVIL DISTURBANCE, PUBLIC CALAMITY (INCLUDING FAMINE, EARTHQUAKE OR PESTILENCE) THE IMMEDIATE OR CONTINUING EFFECTS OF LACK OF NATURAL OR OTHER RESOURCES OR ANY OTHER CAUSE OF POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SUFFERING.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
SALUSBURY WORLD
103 SALUSBURY ROAD
LONDON
NW6 6RG
- Phone:
- 07745 234191
- Email:
- mail@salusburyworld.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window