THE HILLINGDON SLIPSTREAMERS CYCLING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cycling club for children aged 5-16
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 22 January 1999: Standard registration
- HILLINGDON SLIPSTREAMERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Brassil Mr | Chair | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Dawson | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Asti Kanaris | Trustee | 30 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALISON GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.54k | £18.23k | £18.02k | £23.57k | £23.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.20k | £14.59k | £23.32k | £17.23k | £18.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/08/1998 AS AMENDED ON 05/12/1998 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/2011
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BY THE PROMOTION OF SAFE CYCLING BY IMPROVING THE STANDARD OF CHILDREN'S CYCLING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY. (2) THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF SAFE CYCLING BY IMPROVING THE STANDARD OF CHILDREN'S CYCLING AND ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY. (3) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN UNDER SIXTEEN YEARS OLD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 The Greenway
Uxbridge
UB8 2PL
- Phone:
- 01895231888
- Email:
- admin@slipstreamers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window