HAZLEMERE AND WIDMER END GOOD NEIGHBOURS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Transportation of disabled and elderly to hospital/doctors/dentist appointments etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 20 November 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JAMES PEARMAN | Chair | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA FRANCIS | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN THOMAS BALDWIN MR | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
DIANA SURET | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|||||
JOY PAULINE PAYNE | Trustee | 24 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAM JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN LESLIE WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER VIOLET FREEMAN-WOOD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.95k | £4.07k | £19.99k | £7.40k | £10.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.12k | £3.41k | £15.02k | £6.47k | £10.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £212 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 November 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 26TH JANUARY 1998 AS AMENDED ON 26TH OCTOBER 1998.
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF BEING HOUSEBOUND, AGED, DISABLED OR WHO OTHERWISE FACE DIFFICULTIES IN USING PUBLIC TRANSPORT BY PROVIDING A VOLUNTARY CAR AND MINIBUS SERVICE FOR THE TRANSPORT OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
HAZLEMERE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
149 Penn Road
Hazlemere
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP15 7NA
- Phone:
- 01494813598
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window