NORWICH YOUTH FOR CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NYFC exists to take Christianity relevantly to young people so they can make their own informed decision about faith. We also seek to create new and relevant ways for young people to grow in their Christian committment. Our work is in churches, schools and communities through involvement in RE lessons, assemblies, lunch time/after school clubs, youth clubs, mentoring, youth events, camps and more.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Norfolk
Governance
- 14 August 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET HELENA JOAN SMITH | Chair |
|
||||||
Claire Louise Gunn | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tristan Hugh Baldry | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ruth Knights | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DONALD ANDREW GYTON | Trustee | 12 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MARY LYNDS | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.77k | £199.72k | £134.58k | £123.92k | £125.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.83k | £159.61k | £145.53k | £148.93k | £146.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.12k | £7.99k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 1ST MARCH 1998, AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED MADE 13TH JULY 1998
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO PROCLAIM THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN NORWICH AND ITS ENVIRONS. 11. TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE CHRISTIAN EVANGELISATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN NORWICH AND ITS ENVIRONS. 111. TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE POSITIVE CHRISTIAN LIVING. 1V. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS THEREBY DEMONSTRATING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST.
Area of benefit
NORWICH AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carrow House, Floor 2
301 King Street
NORWICH
NR1 2TG
- Phone:
- 01603620678
- Email:
- office@norwichyfc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window