SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF WAKEFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities focus on the advancement of the Baha'i Faith and belief in the essential oneness of the world's revealed religions and on Baha'i ideals of human brotherhood through various means including devotional meetings, children's classes, youth activities, study sessions and interfaith involvement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 May 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ramona-Liza Cleasby | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Steven Cleasby | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 February 2025 | 383 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BAHA'I FAITH AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THAT FAITH. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (WHETHER BAHA'I OR NOT) AND GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
WAKEFIELD AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 RUTLAND GATE
LONDON
SW7 1PD
- Phone:
- 02075842566
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window