Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST. LUCIA'S SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1069825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £3.13k £3.49k £1.16k £1.50k £3.56k
Total expenditure £2.89k £2.12k £613 £2.73k £2.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A