Financial history EARLY BREAK

Charity number: 1072052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.77m £2.18m £3.13m £4.43m £4.95m
Total expenditure £1.66m £1.87m £2.83m £3.92m £4.44m
Income from government contracts £557.98k £496.20k £496.20k £1.47m £4.92m
Income from government grants £47.12k £93.80k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.11k £12.61k £14.12k £12.71k £16.17k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.76m £2.16m £3.11m £4.41m £4.92m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £510 £238 £30 £1.08k £4.07k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £4.15k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.66m £1.87m £2.83m £3.91m £4.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £8.87k £9.62k
Expenditure - Governance £11.93k £16.25k £16.16k £16.76k £19.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0