SYWELL SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1069662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Organising fund raising activities for the Sywell Primary school to provide social and curriculum enrichment for the pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £8,803
Total expenditure: £7,036

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 May 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF SYWELL SCHOOL (Previous name)
  • SYWELL CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Thomson Trustee 11 November 2022
None on record
Julie Lake Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Gemma Johnston-Smith Trustee 02 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.84k £4.00k £1.30k £5.81k £8.80k
Total expenditure £12.68k £9.17k £732 £3.32k £7.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 July 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 July 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 November 2021 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 November 2020 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Sywell C Of E Primary School
69 Overstone Road
Sywell
NORTHAMPTON
NN6 0AW
Phone:
01604644565