ECHOES THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting Jewish culture through theatre. Promoting new writing. Promoting Holocaust Education through theatre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 June 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alastair David Falk | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Thomas | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lerman | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
JEAN GAFFIN OBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS RACHEL FIDLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £13 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH MAY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 27TH JANUARY 1998, 6TH MARCH 1998 AND
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS WITH PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE, REFERENCE TO THE THEATRICAL ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 MARION ROAD
Mill Hill
London
NW7 4AL
- Phone:
- 02089594988
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window