J.k.welfare Alliance

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our organisation provides opportunities for the members to develop themselves educationally, through classes and tuitions, socially through social activities, arts, leisure and multicultural activities, physically, through games, sports & performing arts.we also provide news letter ,leaflets,and verbal news about what is happening back home.we also provide news letter ,leaflets,and verbal news
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
- Luton
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
- India
- Malawi
- Pakistan
- Saudi Arabia
Governance
- 06 May 1999: Standard registration
- JKWA (Working name)
- JAMMAU KASHMIR WELFARE ALLIANCE (JKWA) (Previous name)
- ZAM ZAM WELFARE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor shahid iqbal | Chair | 12 March 1999 |
|
|
||||
Manahil Khan | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
ASLAM RASHEED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £850 | £0 | £0 | £500 | £300 | |
|
Total expenditure | £800 | £0 | £0 | £350 | £250 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 29TH MARCH 1999. as amended on 15 Dec 2020 as amended on 09 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND EDUCATE PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF KASHMIR STATE WHO ARE IN NEED OR ARE VICTIMS OF DISASTERS.
Area of benefit
UK, INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 VANDOME CLOSE , LONDON , E16 3SA
LONDON
E16 3SA
- Phone:
- 02077908668
- Email:
- jkrazad@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window