CARLETON RODE AND BUNWELL PARENT BABY & TODDLER GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mother and Toddler group to provide support and activities for local mothers and their young children. We provide coffee, tea, juice, crafts during a 2 hour session. Children have access to a wide range of play equipment. We also organise christmas party, summer trip and easter and halloween activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 March 1999: Standard registration
- 28 April 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- COUNTRY KITTENS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2004 | 01/08/2007 | 01/08/2008 | 01/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.41k | £1.53k | £1.20k | £679 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.42k | £1.98k | £1.57k | £764 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 6TH OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN, REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION OR MEANS (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE NORWICH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window