LOUIE MEMORIAL PAVILION TRUST

Charity Number: 1070490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of sports / leisure pavilion for local community use, local Youth Club venue

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,245
Total expenditure: £8,285

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 July 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Caroline Potter Chair 24 September 2023
SEACOURT HALL
Received: On time
Daniel Sowah Trustee 24 September 2023
None on record
Shazia Keily Trustee 18 May 2023
None on record
Laura Jones Trustee 04 September 2022
None on record
Terri Matthews Trustee 04 September 2022
BOTLEY YOUTH CLUB
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.04k £11.04k £2.40k £1.79k £2.25k
Total expenditure £1.33k £1.30k £4.71k £3.64k £8.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 March 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Louie Memorial Pavilion Trust
c/o Botley N Hinksey Parish Council
5 Church Way
Botley
Oxford
OX2 9TH
Phone:
07590 194768