ULEY MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity manages the Millennium Green and its environs to:- i) Provide for and encourage the relaxation and informal recreation of residents and visitors. ii) Enhance the "natural" areas by creating a wildflower meadow where wildlife and flora can flourish. iii) Provide an area for community events and celebrations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 27 October 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham George Turnbull | Chair | 10 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Cole | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Robert Coggins | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Caroline Williams | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Ford | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Madge Mary Turnbull | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robin Liam Allen | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Jane Holley | Trustee | 05 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.68k | £2.88k | £1.81k | £1.64k | £3.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.81k | £1.89k | £914 | £2.85k | £1.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30/09/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 21/05/2012
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM TO THE PROVISION OF THE PROPERTY AND SHALL ACCORDINGLY HOLD ANY PROPERTY TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS "ULEY MILLENNIUM GREEN" FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT WITH THESE TRUSTS AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
ULEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 SOUTH STREET
ULEY
DURSLEY
GL11 5SP
- Phone:
- 01453 860066
- Email:
- uleymg@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
charitycommission.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window