Trustees HARBY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1071575

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Margaret Wormold | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Frances Kimbell | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne May Gay | Trustee | 30 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dunlop | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Neale | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert Gay | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Linda Fulton | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.