Financial history OPEN HANDS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1071051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.23k £7.78k £13.05k £15.66k £12.40k
Total expenditure £5.66k £6.41k £11.07k £9.54k £11.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A