BERKHAMSTED PATIENTS MEDICAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserving and protecting the physical and mental well-being of patients in Berkhamsted and district, in particular by the provision of medical equipment and services which would not otherwise be provided in a timely manner by the local health authority.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 26 May 1998: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.95k | £4.00k | £1.79k | £3.58k | £2.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.62k | £3.99k | £3.87k | £15.87k | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 21 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 01 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 16TH FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELL-BEING OF PATIENT SIN BERKHAMSTED AND DISTRICT, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND SERVICES WHICH WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE PROVIDED IN A TIMELY MANNER BY THE LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
BERKHAMSTED AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window