KENSINGTON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1069620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

KSO is an amateur orchestra aiming to promote and develop public education in and appreciation of classical music though its public concerts. KSO prides itself in its commitment to new works and revival of neglected works. It also encourages young musical talent by providing students and amateurs with an opportunity to perform concerts at the highest possible level.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £107,500
Total expenditure: £93,460

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Westminster
  • Kensington And Chelsea
  • Lambeth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 October 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID BAXENDALE Chair
None on record
Judith Robertson Trustee 14 November 2024
None on record
Claire Dovey Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record
Graham Elliott Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Jeremy Lambert Trustee 12 August 2021
None on record
Jonathan Boswell Trustee 18 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £74.32k £54.59k £15.34k £81.97k £107.50k
Total expenditure £72.01k £53.76k £14.08k £69.98k £93.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 22 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 26 MARCH 2008 AS AFFECTED BY UNITING DIRECITION LETTER DATED 13 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
1.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY PROVIDING FUNDS AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR THE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY SO AS TO PROVIDE FOR THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, INCLUDING REVIVAL OF INTEREST IN NEGLECTED WORK, THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF YOUNG MUSICAL TALENT, AND OTHER WAYS OF ACHIEVING THE OBJECT. IN THE EVENT OF THE DISSOLUTION OF THE CHARITY THE TRUST MAY ACHIEVE THE OBJECTS BY PROVIDING FUNDS AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR THE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF OTHER ORCHESTRAS OR MUSICAL ENSEMBLES ("THE OBJECTS"). 1.3 THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE PAID OR APPLIED AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT THE INCOME AND IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS. 1.4 THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE TRUST IN ANY YEAR ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME AND HOLD THE SAME AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE TRUST ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Registration history
  • 16 October 2008 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
34 Grange Road
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Hertfordshire
CM23 5NQ
Phone:
07796950756